LA SR56 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the executive branch agencies under jurisdictional oversight of the Senate Committee on Finance to continue to submit statutorily mandated reports until such time as the mandate is specifically amended or repealed.
Title
Directs the executive branch agencies under jurisdictional oversight of the Senate Committee on Finance to continue to submit statutorily mandated reports until such time as the mandate is specifically amended or repealed.
Sponsors
Sen. Mack White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |