LA SR5 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends Margie Yates Jenkins for her outstanding contributions to horticulture and for being the first woman inducted into the Louisiana Agriculture Hall of Distinction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commends Margie Yates Jenkins for her outstanding contributions to horticulture and for being the first woman inducted into the Louisiana Agriculture Hall of Distinction.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/11/2019.
2019-04-09SenateRead by title and adopted.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback