LA SR49 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/14/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/14/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Wendy Thibodeaux for her many years of public service with the Lafourche Parish Assessor's Office and congratulates her for being named the 2022 Assessor of the Year by the Louisiana Assessors' Association.
Title
Commends Wendy Thibodeaux for her many years of public service with the Lafourche Parish Assessor's Office and congratulates her for being named the 2022 Assessor of the Year by the Louisiana Assessors' Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/14/2022. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |