LA SR47 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends XS Martial Arts Dojo and Save One Now for presenting the 10th Annual Crescent City Kumite being held on May 20, 2017.
Title
Commends XS Martial Arts Dojo and Save One Now for presenting the 10th Annual Crescent City Kumite being held on May 20, 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |