LA SR39 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the systems to report certain investment information including amounts paid to investment professionals.
Title
Urges and requests the systems to report certain investment information including amounts paid to investment professionals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |