LA SR38 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/28/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/28/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health to study programs implemented in other states or through Medicaid waiver programs to evaluate options for delaying institutionalization for frail elders.
Title
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health to study programs implemented in other states or through Medicaid waiver programs to evaluate options for delaying institutionalization for frail elders.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/28/2022. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |