LA SR37 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Katina M. Semien for her service as the 25th South Central Regional Director of Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated.
Title
Commends Katina M. Semien for her service as the 25th South Central Regional Director of Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020. |
2020-06-28 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-06-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |