LA SR37 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests Louisiana State Law Institute to study the feasibility of authorizing "series" limited liability companies in Louisiana.
Title
Requests Louisiana State Law Institute to study the feasibility of authorizing "series" limited liability companies in Louisiana.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Gatti [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |