LA SR35 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the Group Benefits Policy and Planning Board within the office of group benefits to study and prepare a cost benefit analysis for the provision of anti-obesity treatments and services for plan participants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the Group Benefits Policy and Planning Board within the office of group benefits to study and prepare a cost benefit analysis for the provision of anti-obesity treatments and services for plan participants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title and adopted.
2019-04-29SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-04-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback