LA SR33 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Louisiana REALTORS on the occasion of its 100th Anniversary.
Title
Commends Louisiana REALTORS on the occasion of its 100th Anniversary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |