LA SR33 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the 1963 McNeese State College Football Team for its historic season.
Title
Commends the 1963 McNeese State College Football Team for its historic season.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Johns [R] | Sen. Dan Morrish [R] | Sen. John Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |