LA SR30 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and commends the first Zion City Elementary School Reunion on June 11, 2011, and its theme "Raising Zion 60 Years Later."
Title
Recognizes and commends the first Zion City Elementary School Reunion on June 11, 2011, and its theme "Raising Zion 60 Years Later."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/20. | |
2011-05-17 | Read by title and adopted. | |
2011-05-16 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |