LA SR25 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Dr. Christopher F. D'Elia, the dean of LSU's College of the Coast and Environment, on receiving the Wes Tunnell Lifetime Recognition for Gulf Science and Conservation.
Title
Commends Dr. Christopher F. D'Elia, the dean of LSU's College of the Coast and Environment, on receiving the Wes Tunnell Lifetime Recognition for Gulf Science and Conservation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |