LA SR24 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends William Kinnison "Kinny" Haddox on his induction into the Louisiana Chapter of the Legends of the Outdoors National Hall of Fame.
Title
Commends William Kinnison "Kinny" Haddox on his induction into the Louisiana Chapter of the Legends of the Outdoors National Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |