LA SR22 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a study group to study the voting rights of persons incarcerated prior to trial.
Title
Creates a study group to study the voting rights of persons incarcerated prior to trial.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2021. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |