LA SR192 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for legislation to name the I-49 Exit 11 at Louisiana Highway 93 near Sunset and Grand Coteau the "Armand J. Brinkhaus Interchange".
Title
Expresses support for legislation to name the I-49 Exit 11 at Louisiana Highway 93 near Sunset and Grand Coteau the "Armand J. Brinkhaus Interchange".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |