LA SR188 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Joint Legislative Committee on Technology and Cybersecurity to study the impacts of the buying, selling, and usage of consumer data transactions.
Title
Requests the Joint Legislative Committee on Technology and Cybersecurity to study the impacts of the buying, selling, and usage of consumer data transactions.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Reese [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |