LA SR186 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge and request the Louisiana State Law Institute to review state laws, rules, regulations, policies, and procedures related to mental health evaluations used in child custody proceedings.
Title
To urge and request the Louisiana State Law Institute to review state laws, rules, regulations, policies, and procedures related to mental health evaluations used in child custody proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |