LA SR184 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Deputy Bradford Allen Garafola Sr. of the East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Office on being the recipient of the 2017 Deputy Valor Award presented by the Louisiana Sheriffs' Association posthumously.
Title
Commends Deputy Bradford Allen Garafola Sr. of the East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Office on being the recipient of the 2017 Deputy Valor Award presented by the Louisiana Sheriffs' Association posthumously.
Sponsors
Sen. John Alario [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |