LA SR163 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-15)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/24/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses condolences upon the death of military veteran, Dylan Achord.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses condolences upon the death of military veteran, Dylan Achord.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-27SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/24/2019.
2019-05-21SenateRead by title and adopted.
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2019-05-21SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-05-20SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback