LA SR155 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/24/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/24/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Rapides Parish for being declared by the Governor's Council on Physical Fitness and Sports as the Most Physically Fit parish in the state.
Title
Commends Rapides Parish for being declared by the Governor's Council on Physical Fitness and Sports as the Most Physically Fit parish in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/24/2019. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |