LA SR155 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Veronica "Ms. V" Downs-Dorsey on 25 years of teaching vocal music at McDonogh 35 Senior High School and on 35 years as an educator in the Orleans Parish school system.
Title
Commends Veronica "Ms. V" Downs-Dorsey on 25 years of teaching vocal music at McDonogh 35 Senior High School and on 35 years as an educator in the Orleans Parish school system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |