LA SR147 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that legislation allowing school boards and local governing authorities be authorized to go into executive session when discussing economic development projects be included in the call for any special legislative session in 2017.
Title
Requests that legislation allowing school boards and local governing authorities be authorized to go into executive session when discussing economic development projects be included in the call for any special legislative session in 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |