LA SR146 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences to House of Representatives member, Barbara Carpenter, upon the recent death of her husband, Dana Carpenter.
Title
Expresses condolences to House of Representatives member, Barbara Carpenter, upon the recent death of her husband, Dana Carpenter.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SR 146 CO-AUTHORS (#346) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |