LA SR140 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-01 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires captioning of Senate Health and Welfare Committee meetings.
Title
Requires captioning of Senate Health and Welfare Committee meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |