LA SR14 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/19/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/19/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Walter "Walt" Leger III for his dedicated service to the citizens of New Orleans and the state of Louisiana.
Title
Commends Walter "Walt" Leger III for his dedicated service to the citizens of New Orleans and the state of Louisiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SR 14 CO-AUTHORS (#44) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/19/2020. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |