LA SR13 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/28/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/28/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Thursday, April 11, 2024, as Child Advocacy Center Day in Louisiana.
Title
Designates Thursday, April 11, 2024, as Child Advocacy Center Day in Louisiana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/28/2024. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |