LA SR13 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/19/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/19/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Louisiana Tumor Registry, the faculty of LSU Health Sciences Center in New Orleans, and the School of Public Heath for their contributions to the fight against cancer.
Title
Commends the Louisiana Tumor Registry, the faculty of LSU Health Sciences Center in New Orleans, and the School of Public Heath for their contributions to the fight against cancer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/19/2020. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |