LA SR129 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Nursing Supply and Demand Council to study and make recommendations to improve statewide nurse retention in response to the nursing workforce shortage.
Title
Requests the Nursing Supply and Demand Council to study and make recommendations to improve statewide nurse retention in response to the nursing workforce shortage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |