LA SR129 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Johnson & Johnson Global Pro Bono Program, and particularly their current Community Impact Team efforts in New Orleans.
Title
Commends the Johnson & Johnson Global Pro Bono Program, and particularly their current Community Impact Team efforts in New Orleans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |