LA SR126 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Deana Padgett on the occasion of her retirement from Our Lady of Lourdes Regional Medical Center after 45 years of service.
Title
Commends Deana Padgett on the occasion of her retirement from Our Lady of Lourdes Regional Medical Center after 45 years of service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |