LA SR121 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends and congratulates Tracie M. Porter for being named an extraordinary educator for 2021 by Curriculum Associates.
Title
Commends and congratulates Tracie M. Porter for being named an extraordinary educator for 2021 by Curriculum Associates.
Sponsors
Sen. Rogers Pope [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |