LA SR116 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests President Joe R. Biden Jr. and United States Department of Interior Secretary Deb Haaland to immediately adopt a new five-year offshore leasing plan for the Gulf of Mexico to help reduce the cost of energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests President Joe R. Biden Jr. and United States Department of Interior Secretary Deb Haaland to immediately adopt a new five-year offshore leasing plan for the Gulf of Mexico to help reduce the cost of energy.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-06SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
2023-06-02SenateSenate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted.
2023-06-02SenateRules suspended.
2023-06-01SenateReported with amendments.
2023-05-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2023-05-24SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback