LA SR103 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Governor's Task Force on DWI to study issues related to enforcement actions by a drug recognition expert relative to the operation of a motor vehicle when impaired by drugs.
Title
Requests the Governor's Task Force on DWI to study issues related to enforcement actions by a drug recognition expert relative to the operation of a motor vehicle when impaired by drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Gatti [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |