LA SR10 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Board of Regents to study the feasibility of updating TOPS reporting requirements.
Title
Requests the Board of Regents to study the feasibility of updating TOPS reporting requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |