LA SCSR1 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-30 - Returned to the Senate and approved.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-30 - Returned to the Senate and approved.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests study of the safety of pets riding inside of motor vehicles without proper restraint.
Title
Requests study of the safety of pets riding inside of motor vehicles without proper restraint.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Returned to the Senate and approved. |
2017-05-24 | House | Approved on 5/24/2017. |
2017-05-22 | House | Study request list distributed to members on 5/22/2017. |
2017-05-08 | House | Received on 5/8/2017. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the House. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Study request list distributed to the members on 4/28/2017. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Request study by the committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Received by the Senate Office on 4/27/2017. |