LA SCR94 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Peyton Manning upon his induction into the Louisiana Sports Hall of Fame.
Title
Commends Peyton Manning upon his induction into the Louisiana Sports Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Long [R] | Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 94 ADOPT (#282) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2019. |
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-09 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |