LA SCR94 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Affirms the need for civility in political debate as a fundamental requirement for effective representative democracy and governing.
Title
Affirms the need for civility in political debate as a fundamental requirement for effective representative democracy and governing.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ward [R] | Sen. Troy Carter [D] | Rep. Major Thibaut [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 94 ADOPT (#298) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-05-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |