LA SCR92 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Board of Regents to create the Higher Education Maritime Campus Consortium Task Force.
Title
Requests the Board of Regents to create the Higher Education Maritime Campus Consortium Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Vote on SCR 92 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#968) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 92 ADOPT (#611) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 92 ADOPT (#611) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-04 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 1 nays. |
2019-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19. |
2019-05-31 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |