LA SCR8 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-10)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/17/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-10)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/17/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of William A. Oliver.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of William A. Oliver.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 8 ADOPT (#16) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 8 CO-AUTHORS (#15) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 8 CO-AUTHORS (#15) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/17/2020. |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-03-11 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2020-03-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |