LA SCR8 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to take actions to pass the Disability Integration Act of 2019.
Title
Memorializes Congress to take actions to pass the Disability Integration Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Carter [D] | Sen. Regina Barrow [D] | Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D] | Sen. Norby Chabert [R] |
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] | Sen. Bob Hensgens [R] | Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 8 ADOPT (#195) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-05-01 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |