LA SCR75 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 90-42-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests naming the new Grand Bayou Floodgate in Lafourche Parish as the Reggie P. Bagala Floodgate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests naming the new Grand Bayou Floodgate in Lafourche Parish as the Reggie P. Bagala Floodgate.

Sponsors

Sen. Michael Fesi [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Louie Bernard [R]Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]
Sen. Heather Cloud [R]Sen. Patrick Connick [R]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Franklin Foil [R]
Sen. Jimmy Harris [D]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Katrina Jackson [D]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]
Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Patrick McMath [R]Sen. Barry Milligan [R]
Sen. Fred Mills [R]Sen. Robert Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. John Morris [R]
Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Rogers Pope [R]Sen. Edward Price [D]Sen. Mike Reese [R]
Sen. Gary Smith [D]Sen. Kirk Talbot [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Rick Ward [D]
Sen. Glen Womack [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Reggie Bagala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]
Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]
Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Dewith Carrier [R]Rep. Gary Carter [D]
Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]
Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]
Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]
Rep. Michael Echols [R]Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Kathy Edmonston [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]
Rep. Les Farnum [R]Rep. Gabe Firment [R]Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R]Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]
Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]Rep. Larry Frieman [R]Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]
Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. Jonathan Goudeau [R]Rep. Kyle Green [D]
Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Charles Henry [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]
Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. Mike Huval [R]
Rep. John Illg [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]
Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]Rep. Frederick Jones [D]
Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Mandie Landry [D]
Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]
Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Danny McCormick [R]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]
Rep. Scott McKnight [R]Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]
Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Buddy Mincey [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]
Rep. Richard Nelson [R]Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Charles Owen [R]Rep. Robert Owen [R]
Rep. Tammy Phelps [D]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Neil Riser [R]
Rep. Troy Romero [R]Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]
Rep. Larry Selders [D]Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. John Stefanski [R]
Rep. Phillip Tarver [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]
Rep. Debbie Villio [R]Rep. William Wheat [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]
Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]

Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - House - House Vote on SCR 75 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#758) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 75 CO-AUTHORS (#630) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 75 ADOPT (#629) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2020-06-01HouseRead by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays.
2020-05-31HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/01/20.
2020-05-31HouseRead by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-31HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2020-05-31SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2020-05-29SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback