LA SCR71 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority and the Department of Transportation and Development to determine what monies, state or federal, are available for flood control projects in the coastal zone or coastal area, and in the area outside the coastal area.
Title
Requests the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority and the Department of Transportation and Development to determine what monies, state or federal, are available for flood control projects in the coastal zone or coastal area, and in the area outside the coastal area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SCR 71 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#694) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 71 ADOPT (#323) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 71 ADOPT (#323) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/30/2019. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2019-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |