LA SCR70 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-10)
Status: Passed on May 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses condolences upon the death of Dr. Henry Gremillion, Dean of the LSU Health New Orleans School of Dentistry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses condolences upon the death of Dr. Henry Gremillion, Dean of the LSU Health New Orleans School of Dentistry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 70 CO-AUTHORS (#326) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 70 ADOPT (#325) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
2020-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/26/2020.
2020-05-28HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-26SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2020-05-26HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2020-05-26HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2020-05-25SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2020-05-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback