LA SCR70 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/17/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/17/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Destrehan Lady Wildcats for an outstanding, historic season.
Title
Commends the Destrehan Lady Wildcats for an outstanding, historic season.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 70 ADOPT (#376) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/17/2014. |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-04-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2014-04-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |