LA SCR7 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Police Training, Screening, and De-escalation Task Force to study and make recommendations to the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Police Training, Screening, and De-escalation Task Force to study and make recommendations to the legislature.

Sponsors

Sen. Cleo Fields [D]Sen. Mark Abraham [R]Sen. R Allain [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]
Sen. Louie Bernard [R]Sen. Joseph Bouie [D]Sen. Troy Carter [D]Sen. Stewart Cathey [R]
Sen. Patrick Connick [R]Sen. Patrick Cortez [R]Sen. Franklin Foil [R]Sen. Jimmy Harris [D]
Sen. Cameron Henry [R]Sen. Bob Hensgens [R]Sen. Katrina Jackson [D]Sen. Ronnie Johns [R]
Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D]Sen. Barry Milligan [R]Sen. Fred Mills [R]
Sen. Robert Mills [R]Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. Barrow Peacock [R]Sen. Karen Peterson [D]
Sen. Rogers Pope [R]Sen. Edward Price [D]Sen. Mike Reese [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R]Sen. Gregory Tarver [D]Sen. Rick Ward [D]Sen. Glen Womack [R]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]
Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Gary Carter [D]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]
Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]
Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Michael Echols [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R]
Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Kyle Green [D]
Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. Edward James [D]Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]
Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]Rep. Frederick Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]
Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Mandie Landry [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]
Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]
Rep. Scott McKnight [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]
Rep. Buddy Mincey [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Candace Newell [D]Rep. Tammy Phelps [D]
Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Neil Riser [R]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]
Rep. Larry Selders [D]Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. John Stefanski [R]Sen. Francis Thompson [D]
Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]

Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 7 CONCUR (#113) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote on SCR 7 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#118) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote on SCR 7 AMENDMENT # 505 BY BACALA MOTION TO ADOPT (#117) (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote on SCR 7 AMENDMENT # 497 BY MCCORMICK MOTION TO ADOPT (#116) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 7 CO-AUTHORS (#37) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 7 SCR 7 BY FIELDS (#36) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-26SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-25SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-06-24SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-06-24HouseRead by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays.
2020-06-23HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/24/20.
2020-06-23HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-23HouseDischarged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2020-06-22HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2020-06-18HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2020-06-15HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2020-06-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2020-06-14SenateSenate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
2020-06-11SenateReported with amendments.
2020-06-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=SCR7&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180840
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181385
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184254
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181359
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181260
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181975
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182890
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182840
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183811
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183788
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183774
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183985
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183883
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183880
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180841
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182056
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182929
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185296
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182025
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182026
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183889
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184223

Bill Comments

feedback