LA SCR67 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-9)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends Max Fugler upon being inducted into the Louisiana Sports Hall of Fame.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commends Max Fugler upon being inducted into the Louisiana Sports Hall of Fame.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 67 ADOPT (#173) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019.
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-02SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-01SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2019-04-30HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2019-04-29SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback