LA SCR65 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-8)
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-29 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses the intent of the legislature to allocate $100,000,000 of the local government allocation and $100,000,000 from the state allocation from the CARES Act to small businesses, of which $12,500,000 from the local government allocation and $12,500,000 from the state allocation shall be used for minority and women owned businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses the intent of the legislature to allocate $100,000,000 of the local government allocation and $100,000,000 from the state allocation from the CARES Act to small businesses, of which $12,500,000 from the local government allocation and $12,500,000 from the state allocation shall be used for minority and women owned businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 65 CO-AUTHORS (#258) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 65 ADOPT (#257) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-05-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
2020-05-22HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-22HouseDischarged from the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2020-05-21HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2020-05-20SenateSenate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
2020-05-19SenateReported with amendments.
2020-05-18SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback