LA SCR55 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests every parish Office of Emergency Preparedness (OEP) to provide annual training on disaster response for their local and municipal leadership.
Title
Requests every parish Office of Emergency Preparedness (OEP) to provide annual training on disaster response for their local and municipal leadership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 55 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#949) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 55 ADOPT (#408) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 55 ADOPT (#408) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021. |
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2021. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays. |
2021-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021. |
2021-06-01 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-27 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2021-05-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-05-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |