LA SCR54 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Memorializes Congress to maintain funding to the Corporation for National and Community Service and its programs, including the LaVetCorps.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorializes Congress to maintain funding to the Corporation for National and Community Service and its programs, including the LaVetCorps.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 54 FINAL PASSAGE (#153) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (11-0).
2020-05-13HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2020-05-13SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2020-05-12SenateReported favorably.
2020-05-11SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
2020-05-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback